VT S0220 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor June 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - Senate Message: Signed by Governor June 3, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to Vermont’s public libraries
Title
An act relating to Vermont’s public libraries
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Hardy [D] | Sen. Martine Gulick [D] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] | Sen. Wendy Harrison [D] |
Sen. Andrew Perchlik [D] | Sen. Anne Watson [D] | Sen. Rebecca White [D] | Sen. Irene Wrenner [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Hardy, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 6 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | House | Senate Message: Signed by Governor June 3, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 3, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 28, 2024 |
2024-05-10 | House | Senate Message: House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-10 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2024-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2024-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2024-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment |
2024-05-09 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Read third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Second division of amendment disagreed to |
2024-05-07 | House | First division of amendment disagreed to |
2024-05-07 | House | Rep. Cina of Burlington asked that the question be divided |
2024-05-07 | House | Rep. Peterson of Clarendon moved to amend the House proposal of amendment |
2024-05-07 | House | Action Calendar: Third Reading |
2024-05-06 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-05-06 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs agreed to |
2024-05-06 | House | Division results Yes, 97; No, 20 |
2024-05-06 | House | Division demanded |
2024-05-06 | House | Rep. Mrowicki of Putney reported for the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-05-06 | House | Read second time |
2024-05-06 | House | Action Calendar: Unfinished Business |
2024-05-04 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-05-03 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-29 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Hardy, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 6 |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Pending third reading, bill amended as moved by Senator(s) Wrenner |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Wrenner |
2024-03-27 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education amended as moved by Senator Gulick, Campion, Hardy, and Hashim |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Gulick, Campion, Hardy, and Hashim, text |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Baruth for Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Campion for Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Gulick |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Gulick |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Gulick |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Gulick |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Education |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-01-05 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Education |