VT S0180 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
Pending: House Agriculture and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to the use and application of pesticides

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to the use and application of pesticides

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred to the Committee on Agriculture and Forestry
2020-03-13SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2020-03-12Senate3rd reading ordered
2020-03-12SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture agreed to
2020-03-12SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Agriculture
2020-03-13SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2020-03-12SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2020-03-12SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2020-03-11SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
2020-03-11SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2020-01-07SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback