VT S0180 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the Vermont Fair Repair Act
Title
An act relating to the Vermont Fair Repair Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in with proposal of amendment, on motion of Senator Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, Sirotkin, and Soucy |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senator Balint, Baruth, Clarkson, Sirotkin, and Soucy moved to concur in House proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-09 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-07 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-05-04 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2018-05-03 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-05-03 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. |
2018-05-03 | House | Rep. Keenan of St. Albans City recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2018-05-03 | House | Rep. Myers of Essex reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-03 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-05-03 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2018-03-20 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Westman for Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Baruth for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-14 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onEconomic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |