VT S0154 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 14, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to miscellaneous banking provisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to miscellaneous banking provisions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor May 14, 2019
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Governor on May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDelivered to Governor on May 9, 2019
2019-04-25HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2019-04-24SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2019-04-24SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2019-04-24SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2019-04-24SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-04-23SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-04-19SenateUnfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-04-18SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2019-04-17SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2019-04-17SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-04-17SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2019-04-12HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-04-11HouseProposal of amendment of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to
2019-04-11HouseRep. Scheu of Middlebury recommended for the committee on Ways and Means
2019-04-11HouseRep. Kimbell of Woodstock reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2019-04-11HouseRead Second Time
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2019-03-22HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development
2019-03-20SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2019-03-20SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2019-03-19SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered
2019-03-19SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2019-03-19SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2019-03-15SenateFavorable report by Committee on Finance
2019-03-15SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2019-03-14SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback