VT S0137 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-16 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Sears
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-16 - Committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Sears
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to penalties for selling and dispensing marijuana
Title
An act relating to penalties for selling and dispensing marijuana
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-16 | Senate | Committed to Committee on Judiciary on motion of Senator Sears |
2015-05-16 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Sears |
2015-05-16 | Senate | Called up by Senator Sears |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ordered to lie on motion of Senator Sears |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Bill for Second Reading |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2016/S.137 |
Text | http://legislature.vermont.gov/assets/Documents/2016/Docs/BILLS/S-0137/S-0137%20As%20Introduced.pdf |