VT S0110 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor March 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor March 5, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to data privacy and consumer protection
Title
An act relating to data privacy and consumer protection
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Sirotkin [D] | Sen. Rebecca Balint [D] | Sen. Philip Baruth [D] | Sen. Alison Clarkson [D] |
Sen. Ruth Hardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor March 5, 2020 |
2010-03-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor on March 5, 2010 |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on February 28, 2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2020-02-14 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Hooker for Committee, text |
2020-02-14 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-02-12 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2020-02-11 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2019-05-16 | House | Speaker appointed Kimbell of Woodstock, Marcotte of Coventry and Jerome of Brandon as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment not concurred in and committee of conference appointed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Hooker, Baruth, and Sirotkin |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator Sirotkin |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-15 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2019-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2019-05-10 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-05-10 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development agreed to. |
2019-05-10 | House | Rep. Ralph of Hartland reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-05-10 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-05-10 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Motion agreed to |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Baruth, Hardy, Ingram, McNeil, Parent, and Perchlik |
2019-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs agreed to |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hooker for Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Economic Development, Housing and General Affairs |