VT S0104 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Expedited Partner Therapy
Title
An Act Relating To Expedited Partner Therapy
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] | Sen. Timothy Ashe [D] | Sen. Sally Fox [D] | Sen. Virginia Lyons [D] |
Sen. David Zuckerman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 20, 2013 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 17, 2013 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-04-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-04-11 | House | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2013-04-11 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho reported for the committee on Health Care |
2013-04-11 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-03-26 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Pollina for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-03-20 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onHealth and Welfare |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |