VT S0073 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-28 - Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Universal Service Fund
Title
An Act Relating To The Universal Service Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) | |
2009-02-26 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development | |
2009-02-24 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-02-24 | Unfinished Business/Third Reading | |
2009-02-20 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-02-19 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-02-19 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to | |
2009-02-19 | Reported favorably by Senator MacDonald for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-02-19 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-02-19 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance | |
2009-02-19 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onFinance | |
2009-02-17 | Second Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |