VT S0056 | 2023-2024 | Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - Rep. Lanpher of Vergennes moved to commit bill to the Committee on Appropriations, which was agreed to
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to child care and early childhood education

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to child care and early childhood education

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-03HouseRep. Lanpher of Vergennes moved to commit bill to the Committee on Appropriations, which was agreed to
2024-01-03HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-06-20HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-05-12HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-05-11HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-05-10HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-05-09HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a)
2023-04-27HouseReferred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2023-04-27HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-04-21HouseRep. Wood of Waterbury moved to commit bill to the Committee on Education, which was agreed to
2023-04-21HouseAction Calendar: Favorable with Amendment
2023-04-20HouseNotice Calendar: Favorable with amendment
2023-04-05HouseRead first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services
2023-03-31SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2023-03-31SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2023-03-30Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Baruth, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 6
2023-03-30SenateRecommendation of Committee on Health and Welfare, as amended, agreed to
2023-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to
2023-03-30SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2023-03-30SenateReported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment
2023-03-30SenateReported favorably by Senator Cummings for Committee on Finance with recommendation of amendment
2023-03-30SenateRead 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-30SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2023-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2023-03-29SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-29SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations
2023-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2023-03-28SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-28SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-03-23SenateReferred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31
2023-03-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Finance
2023-03-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-23SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-23SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-03-21SenateReferred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2023-03-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare
2023-03-21SenateSecond Reading
2023-03-21SenateEntered on Notice Calendar
2023-02-01SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare

Vermont State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/status/2024/S.56
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2024/Docs/BILLS/S-0056/S-0056%20As%20Introduced.pdf
Texthttps://legislature.vermont.gov/Documents/2024/Docs/BILLS/S-0056/S-0056%20As%20passed%20by%20the%20Senate%20Official.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-Senate-Bills/a0d6c77500/GENERAL-368808-v5-2023_S_56_Child_Care_Fiscal_Note.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-Senate-Bills/80bd6d8b7b/GENERAL-368808-v6-2023_S_56_Child_Care_Fiscal_Note-v3.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-Senate-Bills/c9205eabbb/GENERAL-368808-v7-2023_S_56_Child_Care_Fiscal_Note-SENATE-PASSED.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-Senate-Bills/5bcdb4070d/GENERAL-369627-v6-S_56_Child_Care_-_HHS-Amend.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-Senate-Bills/a4b0b7ff12/GENERAL-369627-v8-S_56_Child_Care_-_HouseED-Amend.pdf
Supplementhttps://ljfo.vermont.gov/assets/Publications/2023-2024-Senate-Bills/25521aa41b/GENERAL-369627-v10-S_56_Child_Care_-WM-v2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://legislature.vermont.gov/bill/roll-call/2024/36

Bill Comments

feedback