VT S0041 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Signed by Governor on February 20, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on February 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-20 - Signed by Governor on February 20, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Water And Sewer Service
Title
An Act Relating To Water And Sewer Service
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Pollina [D] | Sen. Ann Cummings [D] | Sen. William Doyle [R] | Sen. Sally Fox [D] |
Sen. Richard McCormack [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor on February 20, 2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on February 19, 2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Pollina for Committee, text |
2014-01-29 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2014-01-24 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee of Conference report agreed to (Senate bill) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Pollina |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House message House appointed Conference Committee members |
2013-05-14 | House | Speaker appointed Hubert of Milton, Martin of Wolcott and Mook of Bennington as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Ayer, French, and Benning |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment not concurred in; Committee of Conference requested, on motion of Senator White |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-14 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-05-13 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2013-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2013-05-13 | House | Read Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment |
2013-05-13 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2013-05-13 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-05-13 | House | Proposal of Amendment of the Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2013-05-13 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2013-05-13 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-03-29 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senator(s) Pollina, White, Ayer, French, and McAllister motion to amend recommendation of amendment; text |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Consideration resumed |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Pollina |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Consideration postponed to March 22, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Consideration postponed to March 22, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Consideration postponed to 3/22/2013 on motion of Senator Sears |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations with recommendation of amendment |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2013-03-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |