VT S0025 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-09 - Signed by Governor on May 27, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 9 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-09 - Signed by Governor on May 27, 2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The Repeal Or Revision Of Certain State Agency Reporting Requirements
Title
An Act Relating To The Repeal Or Revision Of Certain State Agency Reporting Requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-09 | Signed by Governor on May 27, 2009 | |
2009-05-09 | Delivered to Governor on May 21, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-07 | As passed by Senate and House | |
2009-05-07 | House proposal of amendment concurred in | |
2009-05-07 | House proposal of amendment; text | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-05-07 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read Third time | |
2009-05-07 | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-05-07 | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Consejo of Sheldon | |
2009-05-07 | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset | |
2009-03-25 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-03-23 | Read 3rd time & passed | |
2009-03-23 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-03-20 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-03-20 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to | |
2009-03-20 | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as moved by SenatorWhite | |
2009-03-20 | Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations with recommendation of amendment | |
2009-03-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-03-20 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-03-20 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-03-17 | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading | |
2009-01-20 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |