VT S0020 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 18, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Senate Message, signed by Governor May 18, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to restrictions on perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances and other chemicals of concern in consumer products
Title
An act relating to restrictions on perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances and other chemicals of concern in consumer products
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 145, Nays = 0 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor May 18, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor on May 18, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2021-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-11 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2021-05-11 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-07 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-07 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2021-05-05 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-04 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-05-04 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to |
2021-05-04 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 145, Nays = 0 |
2021-05-04 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington demanded yeas and nays |
2021-05-04 | House | Rep. Whitman of Bennington reported for the Committee on Human Services |
2021-05-04 | House | Read Second time |
2021-03-24 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Human Services |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment agreed to |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend bill offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Lyons for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Lyons |
2021-03-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2021-03-17 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |