VT S0011 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 8, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Senate Message, signed by Governor June 8, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to economic and workforce development
Title
An act relating to economic and workforce development
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | House | Senate Message, signed by Governor June 8, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 8, 2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 2, 2022 |
2022-05-11 | House | Senate Message, report of Committee of Conference adopted |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & ordered delivered to Governor forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Sirotkin for Committee, text |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-11 | Senate | House message: House adopted Conference Committee report |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-11 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (Senate bill) |
2022-05-11 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. LaClair of Barre Town |
2022-05-11 | House | Notice Calendar: Report of Committee of Conference |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Message, Committee of Conference members appointed |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Sirotkin, Clarkson, and Brock |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House message: House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Speaker appointed Marcotte of Coventry, Kimbell of Woodstock and Jerome of Brandon as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2022-05-04 | House | Which was agreed to |
2022-05-04 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock moved the House refuse to concur and asked for a Committee of Conference |
2022-05-04 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-04 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Sirotkin; text |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2022-05-04 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-05-03 | Senate | House message: House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Third time and passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2022-05-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2022-05-03 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of Committee on Commerce and Economic Development as amended agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock, Dickinson of St. Albans Town, Jerome of Brandon, Kascenska of Burke, Laroche of Franklin, Marcotte of Coventry, Mulvaney-Stanak of Burlington, Nicoll of Ludlow, Nigro of Bennington, and White of Bethel moved to amend the report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development, as amended, which was agreed to |
2022-05-03 | House | Report of the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development amended as recommended by the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Toleno of Brattleboro recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Ancel of Calais recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-05-03 | House | Rep. Kimbell of Woodstock reported for the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2022-05-03 | House | Read Second time |
2022-05-03 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-05-02 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2022-04-29 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-04-28 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2021-03-10 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0 |
2021-02-26 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Sears for Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-25 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |