VT S0009 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
Pending: House Government Operations and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs
Pending: House Government Operations and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to the authority of the State Auditor to examine the books and records of State contractors
Title
An act relating to the authority of the State Auditor to examine the books and records of State contractors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 6 (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Government Operations and Military Affairs |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Ingalls, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 23, Nays = 6 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Hardy for Committee on Government Operations |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-02-28 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senator Ingalls requested & granted leave to withdraw motion |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Motion by Senator Ingalls to commit Bill to Committee on Institutions, with Report of Committee on Government Operations intact |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |