VT S0008 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor on June 14, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Signed by Governor on June 14, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to establishing the State Ethics Commission and standards of governmental ethical conduct
Title
An act relating to establishing the State Ethics Commission and standards of governmental ethical conduct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 120, Nays = 24 (Y: 120 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 144, Nays = 1 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109 (Y: 33 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 144, Nays = 1 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109 (Y: 33 N: 109 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 14, 2017 |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 6/14/17 |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on 6/9/17 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | As passed by Senate and House |
2017-05-11 | Senate | House message House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment |
2017-05-10 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 120, Nays = 24 |
2017-05-10 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment to the House Proposal of Amendment agreed to |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2017-05-10 | House | Senate message, House proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to House proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) White; text |
2017-05-10 | Senate | House proposal of amendment; text |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) White |
2017-05-08 | Senate | New Business/House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House Proposal of Amendment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | House message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 144, Nays = 1 |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2017-05-02 | House | Read Third time |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Lippert of Hinesburg moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was agreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Yantachka of Charlotte moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-02 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 72 of 142 to Pass -- Yeas = 33, Nays = 109 |
2017-05-02 | House | Which was disagreed to |
2017-05-02 | House | Rep. Poirier of Barre City moved to amend the House proposal of amendment. |
2017-05-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2017-05-01 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations as amended agreed to |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Deen of Westminster moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington moved to amend the report of the committee on Government Operations, which was agreed to. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Feltus of Lyndon recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2017-05-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2017-02-14 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, Pearson, and White moved to amend bill |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Clarkson, Collamore, Pearson, Pollina, and White |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Pending third reading, motion to amend to be offered by Senator(s) Benning, Ayer, Collamore, Clarkson, Pearson, and White |
2017-02-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations amended as moved by Senator Sears |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment by Senator(s) Sears, text |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Sears for Committee on Appropriations with recommendation of amendment |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation of amendment to be offered by Senator Sears to Recommendation of Amendment of the Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2017-02-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onAppropriations |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Favorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onGovernment Operations |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |