VT S0007 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to deferred sentences and the sex offender registry

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to deferred sentences and the sex offender registry

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseSenate Message, Signed by Governor May 1, 2017
2017-05-01SenateSigned by Governor on May 1, 2017
2017-04-25SenateDelivered to Governor on April 25, 2017
2017-04-14HouseSenate Message, House proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-04-13SenateAs passed by Senate and House
2017-04-13SenateHouse proposal of amendment concurred in
2017-04-13SenateHouse proposal of amendment; text
2017-04-13SenateNew Business/House Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-12SenateHouse Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-11SenateHouse message House passed bill in concurrence with proposal(s) of amendment
2017-04-07HouseRead Third time and Passed in Concurrence with Proposal of Amendment
2017-04-06HouseThird Reading Ordered
2017-04-06HouseReport of Committee on Judiciary as amended agreed to
2017-04-06HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
2017-04-06HouseRep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury reported for the committee on Judiciary
2017-04-06HouseRead Second Time
2017-04-05HouseRep. Willhoit of St. Johnsbury moved to postpone action until April 6, 2017 which was agreed to
2017-03-01HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-24SenateRead 3rd time & passed
2017-02-24SenateNew Business/Third Reading
2017-02-23Senate3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator MacDonald, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2017-02-23SenateRecommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2017-02-23SenateRead second time, reported favorably with recommendation of amendment by Senator Benning for Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-23SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-23SenateUnfinished Business/Second Reading
2017-02-22SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee on Judiciary
2017-02-22SenateNew Business/Second Reading
2017-02-21SenateFavorable report with recommendation of amendment by Committee onJudiciary
2017-01-10SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback