VT S0006 | 2018 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 28, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to short-term rentals
Title
An act relating to short-term rentals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | House | Senate Message, Signed by Governor June 28, 2018 |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor on June 28, 2018 |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor on June 26, 2018 |
2018-06-22 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-22 | House | Passed in concurrence |
2018-06-22 | House | Read Third time |
2018-06-19 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-06-19 | House | Rep. Head of South Burlington reported for the committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2018-06-19 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-06-19 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton |
2018-06-19 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senator Nitka requested & granted leave to abstain from voting pursuant to Senate Rules 69 & 71 |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee bill read first time & placed on Notice Calendar per Senate Rule 48 |