VT JRS054 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on April 26, 2024
Title
Joint resolution relating to weekend adjournment on April 26, 2024
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | House message: House adopted in concurrence |
2024-04-24 | House | Read and adopted in concurrence |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Read & adopted |