VT JRS014 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-02-10 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution establishing a procedure for the conduct of the election of UVM trustees by plurality vote by the General Assembly in 2021
Title
Joint resolution establishing a procedure for the conduct of the election of UVM trustees by plurality vote by the General Assembly in 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | House message: House adopted in concurrence |
2021-02-09 | House | Read and adopted in concurrence |
2021-02-05 | House | Read First time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Adopted on the part of the Senate |
2021-02-04 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |