VT JRS014 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-6)
Status: Passed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - As adopted by Senate and House
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution condemning the murder of Washington Post columnist Jamal Khashoggi and affirming the central importance of freedom of the press
Title
Joint resolution condemning the murder of Washington Post columnist Jamal Khashoggi and affirming the central importance of freedom of the press
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Senate | As adopted by Senate and House |
2019-02-15 | Senate | House message House adopted in concurrence |
2019-02-14 | House | Adopted in Concurrence |
2019-02-13 | House | Read first time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |
2019-02-08 | House | Senate Message, Adopted in concurrence |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Adopted on the part of the Senate |
2019-02-08 | Senate | New Business/Joint Resolution for Adoption |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 |