VT JRH029 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging Congress To Enact A New Homeowner And Bank Protection Act
Title
Joint Resolution Urging Congress To Enact A New Homeowner And Bank Protection Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Adopted | |
2009-05-08 | Adopted in concurrence | |
2009-05-08 | New Business/Joint Resolution for adoption in concurrence | |
2009-05-07 | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 | |
2009-05-06 | Taken up and Adopted on the part of the House | |
2009-05-05 | Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |