VT JRH018 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Finance per Rule 51
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-29 - Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Finance per Rule 51
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Urging Congress To Reauthorize The Federal Terrorism Insurance Program
Title
Joint Resolution Urging Congress To Reauthorize The Federal Terrorism Insurance Program
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Keenan [D] | Rep. William Botzow [D] | Rep. Stephen Carr [D] | Rep. Sarah Copeland-Hanzas [D] |
Rep. Warren Kitzmiller [D] | Rep. Michele Kupersmith [D] | Rep. Michael Marcotte [R] | Rep. Samuel Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Finance per Rule 51 |
2014-04-25 | House | Adopted |
2014-04-25 | House | Read Third time |
2014-04-24 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-04-24 | House | Rep. Kitzmiller of Montpelier reported for the committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
2014-04-24 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-04-04 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill and referred to committee on Commerce and Economic Development |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/summary.cfm?Bill=JRH018&Session=2014 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2014/resolutn/JRH018.pdf |