VT JRH016 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Designating April As Fair Housing Month In Vermont
Title
Joint Resolution Designating April As Fair Housing Month In Vermont
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Adopted | |
2009-04-14 | Adopted in concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | Resolutions for Adoption in Concurrence | |
2009-04-10 | Read 1st time & placed on action calendar per Rule 51 | |
2009-04-10 | Taken up and Adopted | |
2009-04-07 | Action Postponed until 4/10/2009 as moved by Rep Head of South Burlington | |
2009-03-31 | Action Postponed until 4/7/2009 as moved by Rep Head of South Burlington | |
2009-03-27 | Read First Time and placed on Calendar for Action pursuant to Rule 52 |