VT JRH002 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-19 - Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Joint resolution sincerely apologizing and expressing sorrow and regret to all individual Vermonters and their families and descendants who were harmed as a result of State-sanctioned eugenics policies and practices
Title
Joint resolution sincerely apologizing and expressing sorrow and regret to all individual Vermonters and their families and descendants who were harmed as a result of State-sanctioned eugenics policies and practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 1 (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 146, Nays = 0 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 146, Nays = 0 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | House | Senate Message, House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment, text |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-19 | Senate | House proposal of amendment to Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-14 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in with further amendment thereto, as offered by Rep. Stevens of Waterbury |
2021-05-12 | House | Senate Message, adopted in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Collamore |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-12 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collamore, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-12 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Read 1st time & treated as bill; referred to Committee on Government Operations per Rule 51 |
2021-04-01 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-01 | House | Read Third time |
2021-03-31 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-31 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs agreed to |
2021-03-31 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 146 to Pass -- Yeas = 146, Nays = 0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rep. Donahue of Northfield demanded yeas and nays |
2021-03-31 | House | Rep. Stevens of Waterbury reported for the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |
2021-03-31 | House | Read Second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Read First time, treated as a bill, and referred to the Committee on General, Housing, and Military Affairs |