VT HCR347 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-03 - Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-03 - Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
House Concurrent Resolution In Memory Of The American Military Personnel Who Have Died In The Service Of Their Nation In Iraq Or Afghanistan From January 1, 2010 To April 10, 2010
Title
House Concurrent Resolution In Memory Of The American Military Personnel Who Have Died In The Service Of Their Nation In Iraq Or Afghanistan From January 1, 2010 To April 10, 2010
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Howard [D] | Rep. Willem Jewett [D] | Rep. Leigh Larocque [R] | Rep. Michael Obuchowski [D] |
Rep. Paul Poirier [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-03 | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b | |
2010-05-03 | Adopted in concurrence pursuant to Joint Rule 16b | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 4/30/2010 |