VT HCR337 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
House Concurrent Resolution Congratulating The Woodford Elementary School On Its Bicentennial Anniversary
Title
House Concurrent Resolution Congratulating The Woodford Elementary School On Its Bicentennial Anniversary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Adopted in concurrence per Joint Rule 16b | |
2010-04-27 | Adopted in concurrence pursuant to Joint Rule 16b | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 4/23/2010 |
Vermont State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/database/status/summary.cfm?Bill=HCR337&Session=2010 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.vt.us/docs/2010/Acts/ACTR452.pdf |