VT H0959 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 30, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to education property tax
Title
An act relating to education property tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-03 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 13, Nays = 131 (Y: 13 N: 131 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2020-06-03 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 97 (Y: 48 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-05-29 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 20 (Y: 127 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - House - Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 97 (Y: 48 N: 97 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2020-05-29 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 20 (Y: 127 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 30, 2020 |
2020-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor on June 30, 2020 |
2020-06-26 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2020-06-26 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 26, 2020 |
2020-06-25 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2020-06-25 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-24 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2020-06-24 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Pearson for Committee on Finance |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-24 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-06-03 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-06-03 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2020-06-03 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 13, Nays = 131 |
2020-06-03 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Ralph of Hartland disagreed to |
2020-06-03 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Ralph of Hartland disagreed to |
2020-06-03 | House | Roll Call Results Failed -- Needed 73 of 145 to Pass -- Yeas = 48, Nays = 97 |
2020-06-03 | House | Rep. McFaun of Barre Town demanded yeas and nays |
2020-06-03 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Browning of Arlington disagreed to |
2020-06-03 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury, Till of Jericho, Ancel of Calais, Anthony of Barre City, Brennan of Colchester, Canfield of Fair Haven, Donovan of Burlington, Kornheiser of Brattleboro, Masland of Thetford, Scheu of Middlebury, and Young of Greensboro agreed to |
2020-05-29 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2020-05-29 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 74 of 147 to Pass -- Yeas = 127, Nays = 20 |
2020-05-29 | House | Rep. Browning of Arlington demanded yeas and nays |
2020-05-29 | House | Rep. Beck of St. Johnsbury spoke for the committee on Ways and Means |
2020-05-29 | House | Read Second Time |
2020-05-29 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2020-05-29 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 05/29/20 |