VT H0895 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to legislative review of certain report requirements
Title
An act relating to legislative review of certain report requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Bill Requested by Governor, Delivered on May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-05 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2018-05-03 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment considered |
2018-05-03 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Savage of Swanton |
2018-05-02 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-27 | House | Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Read Third time |
2018-02-27 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-02-27 | House | Rep. Pugh of South Burlington moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-23 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-23 | House | Rep. Weed of Enosburgh spoke for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-23 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 22, 2018 |