VT H0894 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 20, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The City Of Montpelier And To Merging The Montpelier Fire District No. 1 Into The City Of Montpelier
Title
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The City Of Montpelier And To Merging The Montpelier Fire District No. 1 Into The City Of Montpelier
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 20, 2014 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2014-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Pollina for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed |
2014-04-29 | House | Read Third time |
2014-04-25 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-04-25 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-04-25 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-04-17 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |