VT H0871 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-17 - Signed by Governor on 5/17/16
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Montpelier
Title
An act relating to approval of amendments to the charter of the City of Montpelier
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/17/16 |
2016-05-16 | House | Delivered to the Governor on 5/16/16 |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Degree for Committee on Finance |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2016-05-06 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Finance with the report of Committee on Government Operations intact, on motion of Senator White |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Government Operations on motion of Senator Campbell |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2016-05-02 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2016-04-29 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2016-04-29 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2016-04-29 | House | Rep. Condon of Colchester, recommended for the committee on Ways and Means |
2016-04-29 | House | Rep. Martin of Wolcott reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2016-04-29 | House | Read Second Time |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways & Means per Rule 35(a) |
2016-03-17 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |