VT H0869 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Agricultural Subjects
Title
An Act Relating To Miscellaneous Agricultural Subjects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-08 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 28, 2014 |
2014-05-09 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-09 | House | Rep. Turner of Milton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Collins, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as moved by Senator(s) Galbraith |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment amended on motion of Senator(s) Galbraith and Hartwell |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Galbraith and Hartwell; text |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as moved by Senator(s) Starr |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Starr; text |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as moved by Senator(s) Starr, French, McAllister, Sirotkin, and Zuckerman |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Senator(s) Starr, French, McAllister, Sirotkin, and Zuckerman; text |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Lyons for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator McAllister for Committee on Agriculture |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-08 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Galbraith and Hartwell |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Zuckerman |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Starr, French, McAllister, Sirotkin, and Zuckerman |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2014-03-21 | House | Passed |
2014-03-21 | House | Read Third time |
2014-03-20 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-03-20 | House | Rep. Johnson of Canaan reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2014-03-20 | House | Rep. Connor of Fairfield spoke for the committee on Agriculture and Forest Products |
2014-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2014-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on March 11, 2014 |