VT H0843 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 1, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to technical corrections
Title
An act relating to technical corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 1, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | House | Signed by Governor on May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-04-10 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-06 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-20 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-16 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-16 | House | Report of Committee on Government Operations agreed to. |
2018-02-16 | House | Rep. Harrison of Chittenden reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2018-02-16 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-02 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |