VT H0799 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to notice of sale of property subject to unpaid property taxes
Title
An act relating to notice of sale of property subject to unpaid property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed |
2018-02-07 | House | Read Third time |
2018-02-07 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-02-07 | House | Rep. Murphy of Fairfax moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-06 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-06 | House | Rep. Burditt of West Rutland spoke for the committee on Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-02-02 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 2, 2018 |