VT H0781 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-09 - Signed by Governor on 6/4/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Renewable Energy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Renewable Energy

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-09 Signed by Governor on 6/4/2010
2010-05-12 Delivered to the Governor on 6/1/2010
2010-05-08 Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in
2010-06-09 Signed by Governor on 6/4/2010
2010-05-08 Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin
2010-05-08 Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment
2010-05-08 Unfinished Business/Third Reading
2010-05-07 New Business/Third Reading
2010-05-06 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Lyons, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 30, Nays = 0
2010-05-06 Proposal of amendment agreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Sears, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 28, Nays = 1
2010-05-06 Senator(s) Illuzzi motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-06 Motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment disagreed to on roll call, requested by Senator Nitka, Failed -- Needed 15 of 28 to Pass -- Yeas = 5, Nays = 23
2010-05-06 Senator(s) Hartwell and Sears motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-06 Senator Flory requested & granted leave to withdraw motion
2010-05-06 Senator(s) Flory and McCormack motion to amend proposal of amendment; text
2010-05-06 Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance agreed to
2010-05-06 Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to
2010-05-06 Proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance amended as moved by Senator(s) McCormack
2010-05-06 Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy amended as moved by Senator(s) Lyons
2010-05-06 Read 2nd time
2010-05-06 Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Mazza
2010-05-06 Proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Flory and McCormack
2010-05-06 Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance
2010-05-06 Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2010-05-06 Second Reading
2010-04-30 Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31
2010-04-30 Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2010-04-30 Second Reading
2010-04-16 Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. Komline of Dorset
2010-04-16 Read Third time and Passed
2010-04-15 Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 67 of 132 to Pass -- Yeas = 129, Nays = 3
2010-04-15 Rep. Klein of East Montpelier demanded yeas and nays
2010-04-15 Third Reading Ordered
2010-04-15 Rep. Cheney of Norwich moved to amend the bill which was agreed to
2010-04-15 Amendment of Committee on Ways and Means agreed to
2010-04-15 Amendment of Committee on Judiciary agreed to
2010-04-15 Rep. Jewett of Ripton moved to amend the recommendation of amendment offered by Ways and Means
2010-04-15 Rep. Sharpe of Bristol reported for the committee on Ways and Means
2010-04-15 Rep. Cheney of Norwich spoke for the committee on Natural Resources and Energy
2010-04-15 Read Second Time
2010-04-07 Committed to Committee on Judiciary by motion of Rep. Sharpe of Bristol
2010-04-07 Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. Sharpe of Bristol
2010-03-18 Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a)
2010-03-17 Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 3/18/2010

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback