VT H0718 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 27, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 27, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to approval of the dissolution of Colchester Fire District No. 1
Title
An act relating to approval of the dissolution of Colchester Fire District No. 1
Sponsors
Rep. Curt Taylor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed by Governor on April 27, 2022 |
2022-04-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 21, 2022 |
2022-04-15 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2022-04-14 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-13 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Government Operations per Temporary Senate Rule 44A |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2022-03-24 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2022-03-24 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Brennan of Colchester recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-03-23 | House | Rep. Lefebvre of Orange reported for the Committee on Government Operations |
2022-03-23 | House | Read Second time |
2022-03-23 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-22 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2022-03-08 | House | Read First Time and referred to the Committee on Government Operations |