VT H0690 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to explanation of advance directives and treating clinicians who may sign a DNR/COLST
Title
An act relating to explanation of advance directives and treating clinicians who may sign a DNR/COLST
Sponsors
Rep. Sandy Haas [D] | Rep. Ann Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 0 (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Signed by Governor on May 3, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Senate Message, Passed in Concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2018-04-18 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-04-17 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2018-02-09 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2018-02-09 | House | Second instance of amendment disagreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | First Instance of amendment agreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester asked that the question be divided |
2018-02-09 | House | Rep. Till of Jericho moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-09 | House | Which was agreed to |
2018-02-09 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester moved to amend the bill |
2018-02-08 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2018-02-08 | House | Report of Committee on Human Services agreed to. |
2018-02-08 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 68 of 135 to Pass -- Yeas = 135, Nays = 0 |
2018-02-08 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester reported for the committee on Human Services |
2018-02-08 | House | Read Second Time |
2018-01-23 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |