VT H0614 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to land improvement fraud and timber trespass
Title
An act relating to land improvement fraud and timber trespass
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Mihaly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Agriculture |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee on Judiciary relieved; bill committed to Committee on Agriculture on motion of Senator Sears |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-20 | House | Read third time and passed |
2024-03-20 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2024-03-19 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2024-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry, as amended, agreed to |
2024-03-19 | House | Report of Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry amended as recommended by Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Mihaly of Calais recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Demrow of Corinth recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Chapin of East Montpelier reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | House | Rep. Lipsky of Stowe reported for the Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry |
2024-03-19 | House | Read second time |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2024-03-15 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2024-03-13 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-02-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2024-02-27 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-02-02 | House | Rep. LaLonde of South Burlington moved to suspend rules to take up for immediate consideration and commit to Committee on Judiciary, which was agreed to |
2024-02-02 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2024-01-03 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Food Resiliency, and Forestry |