VT H0542 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 18, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government
Title
An act relating to making appropriations for the support of government
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 3 (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 1 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 1 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5 (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 1 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 1 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 18, 2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor on June 18, 2019 |
2019-06-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 12, 2019 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House message House adopted Conference Committee report |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney. |
2019-05-24 | House | Committee of Conference report adopted (House bill) |
2019-05-24 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate message, report of committee of conference adopted |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference report adopted on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 14 of 27 to Pass -- Yeas = 24, Nays = 3 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Committee of Conference report submitted by Senator Kitchel for Committee, text |
2019-05-24 | Senate | New Business/Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee of Conference Report |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Rules suspended & action messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Mazza |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference appointed: Senators Kitchel, Sears, and Westman |
2019-05-09 | Senate | House message House refused to concur in Senate proposal of amendment & requested Conference Committee; House Conference Committee members appointed |
2019-05-08 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-08 | House | Speaker appointed Toll of Danville, Hooper of Montpelier and Fagan of Rutland City as members of the Committee of Conference on the part of the House |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment not concurred in and Committee of Conference requested upon motion of Rep. Toll of Danville |
2019-05-08 | House | Rules Suspended and Taken up for Immediate Consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2019-05-08 | House | Senate Message, passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Ashe |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Lyons and Sears motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Proposal of amendment agreed to |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Pending third reading, Senator(s) Kitchel, Ashe, McCormack, Nitka, Sears, Starr, and Westman motion to amend proposal of amendment; text |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Pending third reading motion to amend Senate proposal of amendment to be offered by Senator(s) Kitchel, Ashe, McCormack, Nitka, Sears, Starr, and Westman |
2019-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2019-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered on roll call, requested by Senator Mazza, Passed -- Needed 16 of 30 to Pass -- Yeas = 25, Nays = 5 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations agreed to |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-29 | House | Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 70 of 138 to Pass -- Yeas = 137, Nays = 1 |
2019-03-29 | House | Read Third time |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2019-03-28 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 71 of 140 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 1 |
2019-03-28 | House | Rep. Toll of Danville spoke for the committee on Appropriations |
2019-03-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on March 27, 2019 |