VT H0433 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-08 - Signed by Governor on 5/8/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The Town Of Berlin
Title
An Act Relating To Approval Of Amendments To The Charter Of The Town Of Berlin
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Signed by Governor on 5/8/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Delivered to the Governor on 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence | |
2009-04-30 | New Business/Third Reading | |
2009-04-29 | 3rd reading ordered | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably by Senator Doyle for Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-04-29 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-29 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-04-29 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2009-04-28 | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-04-17 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations | |
2009-04-14 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2009-04-10 | Read Second Time and Third Reading Ordered | |
2009-04-10 | Rep. McDonald of Berlin reported for the committee on Government Operations | |
2009-03-20 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |