VT H0403 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Community Supports For Persons With Serious Functional Impairments
Title
An Act Relating To Community Supports For Persons With Serious Functional Impairments
Sponsors
Rep. Sandy Haas [D] | Rep. Lynn Batchelor [R] | Rep. Susan Davis [D] | Rep. Anne Donahue [R] |
Rep. Mary Hooper [D] | Rep. Joan Lenes [D] | Rep. Linda Waite-Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/14/2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed the House and Senate on 5/8/2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2013-05-08 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-05-07 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Fox for Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Fox for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-05-07 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill committed to Committee on Appropriations with the report of Committee on Health and Welfare intact, on motion of Senator Fox |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Fox |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Committee on Rules relieved; bill committed to Committee on Health and Welfare on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-04-25 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2013-04-24 | House | Amendment as offered by Rep. Batchelor of Derby agreed to |
2013-04-23 | House | Rep. Manwaring of Wilmington, recommended for the committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-23 | House | Rep. Haas of Rochester reported for the committee on Human Services |
2013-04-23 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-04-23 | House | Action Postponed to next legislative day as moved by Rep. Haas of Rochester |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2013-02-27 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |