VT H0401 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/6/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-06 - Signed by Governor on 5/6/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Municipal And Regional Planning And Flood Resilience
Title
An Act Relating To Municipal And Regional Planning And Flood Resilience
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-06 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/6/2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-04-26 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Campbell |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy agreed to |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Snelling for Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2013-04-23 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Natural Resources and Energy |
2013-03-12 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-03-01 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-02-28 | House | Rep. Rep. Quimby of Concord spoke for the committee on Fish, Wildlife & Water Resources |
2013-03-01 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar for Notice on 2/27/2013 |