VT H0342 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

An act relating to qualification for a public defender

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relating to qualification for a public defender

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateRead 1st time & referred to Committee on Rules
2019-03-27HouseRead Third time and Passed
2019-03-26HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-26HouseWhich was agreed to
2019-03-26HouseRep. Hashim of Dummerston moved to amend the bill
2019-03-26HouseRep. Conquest of Newbury recommended for the committee on Appropriations
2019-03-26HouseRead Second Time
2019-03-20HouseRep. Grad of Moretown moved that the bill be committed to the committee on Appropriations which was agreed to.
2019-03-19HouseThird Reading Ordered
2019-03-19HouseRep. Hashim of Dummerston reported for the committee on Judiciary
2019-03-19HouseRead Second Time
2019-02-21HouseRead First Time and Referred to the Committee on Judiciary

Vermont State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback