VT H0338 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on April 21, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to reapportionment proposal deadlines
Title
An act relating to reapportionment proposal deadlines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor on April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | House | Delivered to the Governor on April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Third Reading |
2021-04-07 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Collamore for Committee on Government Operations, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-04-06 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2021-02-26 | House | Rules suspended and bill messaged forthwith to the Senate as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-02-26 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-02-26 | House | Rules suspended and bill placed in all remaining stages of passage as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-02-26 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-02-26 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell spoke for the Committee on Government Operations |
2021-02-26 | House | Read Second time |
2021-02-24 | House | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on February 25, 2021 |