VT H0315 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Signed by Governor on 5/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-2-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Signed by Governor on 5/20/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Group Health Coverage For Same-sex Spouses
Title
An Act Relating To Group Health Coverage For Same-sex Spouses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-01 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Shall the bill be read the third time? (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-15 - House - Shall the bill be read a third time? (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/20/2013 |
2013-05-03 | House | Passed the House and Senate on 5/3/2013 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2013-05-02 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Roll Call, requested by Senator Campbell, Passed -- Needed 15 of 29 to Pass -- Yeas = 29, Nays = 0 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Mullin for Committee on Finance, read 2nd time and 3rd reading ordered |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2013-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2013-03-19 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-03-15 | House | Roll Call Results Passed -- Needed 73 of 144 to Pass -- Yeas = 139, Nays = 5 |
2013-03-15 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2013-03-15 | House | Amendment of Committee on Health Care agreed to |
2013-03-15 | House | Rep. Poirier of Barre City reported for the committee on Health Care |
2013-03-15 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-02-21 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Health Care |