VT H0289 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to professions and occupations regulated by the Office of Professional Regulation
Title
An act relating to professions and occupations regulated by the Office of Professional Regulation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 8, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Signed by Governor on June 8, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 2, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2021-05-20 | House | Senate proposal of amendment concurred in |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended and taken up for immediate consideration as moved by Rep. McCoy of Poultney |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Balint |
2021-05-19 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations, as amended, agreed to |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations amended as recommended by Committee on Finance |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Starr for Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Hardy for Committee on Finance with proposal of amendment |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Clarkson for Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-19 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Finance |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2021-03-11 | House | Read Third time and passed |
2021-03-10 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2021-03-10 | House | Rep. Townsend of South Burlington recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2021-03-10 | House | Rep. Durfee of Shaftsbury recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2021-03-10 | House | Rep. Colston of Winooski spoke for the Committee on Government Operations |
2021-03-10 | House | Read Second time |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2021-02-18 | House | Committee bill read first time |