VT H0275 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-28 - Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Unemployment Insurance Benefits For Military Spouses
Title
An Act Relating To Unemployment Insurance Benefits For Military Spouses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Finance |
2014-02-26 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-02-25 | House | Third Reading Ordered |
2014-02-25 | House | Report of Committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs agreed to. |
2014-02-25 | House | Rep. Vowinkel of Hartford spoke for the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs |
2014-02-25 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-01-29 | House | Rep. Sweaney of Windsor moved that the committee on Government Operations be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to. |
2013-02-14 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |