VT H0237 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-06 - Committed to Committee on Appropriations with report of Committee on Government Operations intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Shumlin
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-06 - Committed to Committee on Appropriations with report of Committee on Government Operations intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Shumlin
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Governance Of The Vermont State Hospital
Title
An Act Relating To Governance Of The Vermont State Hospital
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret Andrews [D] | Rep. Anne Donahue [R] | Rep. Michael Fisher [D] | Rep. William Frank [D] |
Rep. Michael Mrowicki [D] | Rep. Scott Orr [D] | Rep. Ann Pugh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-06 | Committed to Committee on Appropriations with report of Committee on Government Operations intact, under suspension of Senate Rule 49, on motion of Senator Shumlin | |
2010-04-06 | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator White for Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-04-06 | New Business/Second Reading | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations | |
2010-03-09 | Read Third time and Passed | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Ordered | |
2010-02-26 | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to | |
2010-02-26 | Rep. Donahue of Northfield spoke for the committee on Human Services | |
2010-02-26 | Read Second Time | |
2009-02-19 | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |