VT H0227 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-10 - Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Licensing And Regulating Property Inspectors
Title
An Act Relating To Licensing And Regulating Property Inspectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-10 | House | Signed by Governor on May 22, 2014 |
2014-05-10 | House | Rules Suspended and Action on the bill messaged to the Senate forthwith and the bill delivered to the Governor forthwith as moved by Rep. Turner of Milton. |
2014-05-10 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2014-05-10 | House | Rep. Savage of Swanton moved to suspend rules and take up bill for immediate consideration |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & bill placed on all remaining stages of passage, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations agreed to |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Galbraith for Committee on Finance |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator French for Committee on Government Operations |
2014-05-10 | Senate | Rules suspended & taken up for immediate consideration, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2014-05-10 | House | Senate message passed in Concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Government Operations |
2014-03-11 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell, Cole of Burlington, Consejo of Sheldon, Devereux of Mount Holly, Evans of Essex, Hubert of Milton, Lewis of Berlin, Martin of Wolcott, Mook of Bennington, Sweaney of Windsor, and Townsend of South Burlington moved to amend the bill which was agreed to |
2014-02-28 | House | Amendment of Committee on Government Operations agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2014-02-28 | House | Rep. Branagan of Georgia reported for the committee on Ways and Means |
2014-02-28 | House | Rep. Higley of Lowell reported for the committee on Government Operations |
2014-02-28 | House | Read Second Time |
2014-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2014-02-12 | House | Rep. Weed of Enosburgh moved that the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs be relieved of the bill and that the same be committed to the committee on Government Operations which was agreed to. |
2013-02-14 | House | Rep. Sweaney of Windsor moved to commit bill to the committee on General, Housing and Military Affairs which was agreed to. |
2013-02-08 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Government Operations |