VT H0178 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Signed by Governor on 5/14/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Anatomical Gifts
Title
An Act Relating To Anatomical Gifts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Signed by Governor on 5/14/2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | House message: House concurred in Senate proposal of amendment |
2013-05-06 | House | Senate Proposal of Amendment concurred in |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence with proposal of amendment |
2013-05-01 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2013-04-30 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare agreed to |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Fox for Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time, reported favorably with proposal of amendment by Senator Ayer for Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-04-26 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report with proposal of amendment by Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Health and Welfare |
2013-03-21 | House | Read Third time and Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment of Committee on Human Services agreed to and Third Reading Ordered |
2013-03-18 | House | Rep. Rep. Donahue of Northfield reported for the committee on Human Services |
2013-03-20 | House | Read Second Time |
2013-02-05 | House | Read First Time and Referred to the Committee on Human Services |