VT H0175 | 2023-2024 | Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An act relating to modernizing the Children and Family Council for Prevention Programs
Title
An act relating to modernizing the Children and Family Council for Prevention Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | House message: Governor approved bill on June 19, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor on June 19, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | House | Delivered to the Governor on June 13, 2023 |
2023-05-11 | House | Senate Message, passed in concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended & messaged to House forthwith, on motion of Senator Baruth |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time & passed in concurrence |
2023-05-11 | Senate | New Business/Third Reading |
2023-05-10 | Senate | 3rd reading ordered |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Kitchel for Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator McCormack for Committee on Finance |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably by Senator Norris for Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-10 | Senate | New Business/Second Reading |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Senate Rule 31 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Finance |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance per Senate Rule 31 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Favorable report by Committee on Judiciary |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Entered on Notice Calendar |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-16 | House | Read third time and passed |
2023-03-16 | House | Action Calendar: Third reading |
2023-03-15 | House | Third Reading ordered |
2023-03-15 | House | Report of Committee on Judiciary agreed to |
2023-03-15 | House | Rep. Squirrell of Underhill recommended for the Committee on Appropriations |
2023-03-15 | House | Rep. Masland of Thetford recommended for the Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-03-15 | House | Rep. Christie of Hartford reported for the Committee on Judiciary |
2023-03-15 | House | Read second time |
2023-03-15 | House | Action Calendar: Favorable with Amendment |
2023-03-14 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations per Rule 35(a) |
2023-02-21 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means per Rule 35(a) |
2023-02-16 | House | Notice Calendar: Favorable with amendment |
2023-02-07 | House | Read first time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary |